THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:41:18 AM
Sadek, Amel Henein Fahim
CPSO#:
81889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
6 Clairmont Street
Thorold ON L2V 1R1
Phone: (905) 680-9703
Fax: (905) 680-9705
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMEL HENEIN FAHIM SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 24, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)