THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:28:35 PM
El Khouly, Nihal Abdel Ghany El Said
CPSO#:
81880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
206-170 McEwan Dr E
Bolton ON L7E 4C8
Phone: 905-857-3474
Fax: 905-951-7856
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIHAL ABDEL GHANY EL SAID EL KHOULY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL KHOULY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2004 to 07 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |