THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:45:43 PM
Mesterman, Ronit Ester
CPSO#:
81877
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hebrew
Education: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
H S C 3A56
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73392
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
|
Active |