THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:26:56 AM
Dag-Ellams, Ugonwa
CPSO#:
81859
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Justus Liebig University of Giessen, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1079 Maple Ave
Maple Medical Center
Milton ON L9T 0A5
Phone: 9058761011
Fax: 9058763401
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Aug 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UGONWA DAG-ELLAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAG-ELLAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Aug 2004 to 17 Nov 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2006 |