THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:17:30 AM
Chesney, Alden Egaton
CPSO#:
81853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
403N 13th Street
Clin Path - Hematology, Rm 665-O
VCU Medical Center
Richmond VA 23298-5060
United States
Phone: 804-628-1319
Fax: 804-828-1523
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Chesney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Guyana
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:01 Jul 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2017 |
|
Active |