THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:50:38 AM
Redfearn, Damian Paul
CPSO#:
81848
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leicester, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3377
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Apr 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:04 Apr 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2004 to 04 Oct 2004
PEAP - CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |
|
Active |