THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:10:29 PM
Trambitas, Camelia Alexandra
CPSO#:
81844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4300
Fax: (905) 721-6695
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAMELIA ALEXANDRA TRAMBITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAMBITAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 23 Nov 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2006 |