THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:32:46 AM
Rachakonda, Ramanamurthy Venkatappiah
CPSO#:
81839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu
Education: Gujarat University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5489
Fax: 519-749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
|
Active |