THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:07:32 PM
Asfaha, Samuel
CPSO#:
81836
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6582
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:07 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL ASFAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASFAHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2014 |