THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:21:32 PM
Bettolli, Marcos Bettolli
CPSO#:
81834
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of General Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2878
Fax: (613) 738-4849
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
|
Active |