THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:52:11 AM
Youssef, Elham AB Ali
CPSO#:
81832
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
450 Westheights Dr., Unit 11
Kitchener ON N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 725-4070
Fax: (519) 725-4071
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELHAM AB ALI YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2005 to 23 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2007 |