THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:06:09 PM
Kakavand, Farid
CPSO#:
81830
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi, Iranian, Kurdi
Education: Bangalore University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: (905) 535-7800
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARID KAKAVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKAVAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2004 to 18 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2006 |