THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:15:21 PM
Martinez Motta, Jose Carlos
CPSO#:
81827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 624-9796
Fax: (519) 624-0390
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |
|
Active |