THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:06:09 PM
Mulligan, Anna Marie
CPSO#:
81796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163403072
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 May 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 04 May 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
|
Active |