THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:10:29 AM
Naom, Nashwan Albeer Ibrahim
CPSO#:
81789
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Oct 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
3-Dec-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Naom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2023 |