THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:24:24 AM
Ghaffar-Sedeh, Maryam
CPSO#:
81774
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM GHAFFAR-SEDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR-SEDEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2004 to 22 Oct 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2006 |