THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:04:57 AM
Sourovtseva, Elena Anatolyevna
CPSO#:
81773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Saratov State Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 815-2571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELENA ANATOLYEVNA SOUROVTSEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUROVTSEVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2006 |