THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:38:32 PM
De Souza, Darina Marie
CPSO#:
81772
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARINA MARIE DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 27 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 28 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2006 |