THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:38:54 AM
Balendran, Nalayini
CPSO#:
81768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: Monash University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3, Technology Place
Macquarie University
Sydney 2109
Australia
Phone: 02 9158 0539
Fax: 02 9430 1199
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 14 2011
Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NALAYINI BALENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALENDRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2011 |