THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:20:07 AM
Samuel, Maged Yousef Nasief
CPSO#:
81766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
809 Brant Street
Burlington ON L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 681-1212
Fax: (905) 681-1216
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGED YOUSEF NASIEF SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2007 |