THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:11:25 AM
Rajendran, Bakirathan
CPSO#:
81763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6861
Fax: (705) 740-6899
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAKIRATHAN RAJENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJENDRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
EL - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2007 |