THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:44:34 AM
Al-Kassem, Anas
CPSO#:
81756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, German
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
223 West Street Upper
Simcoe ON N3Y 1S9
Phone: (226) 440-3055
Fax: (226) 440-3056
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANAS AL-KASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KASSEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2004 to 21 Sep 2004
AVP - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2010 |