THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:36:09 AM
Mohammed, Naufal
CPSO#:
81754
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Calicut University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Medicine
628 Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44130
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAUFAL MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2008 |