THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:25:03 AM
Dhir, Shalini
CPSO#:
81737
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
SJHC, Department of Anesthesia
& Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |