THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:44:05 PM
Ghorab, Zeina
CPSO#:
81735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Tichreen, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anatomic Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E433
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7355
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:19 Apr 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |