THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:17:10 AM
McConville, Fiona Claire
CPSO#:
81734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Cincinnati, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Medical Centre
216-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 420-5856
Fax: (905) 420-7076
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: McConville Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FIONA CLAIRE MCCONVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONVILLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2019 |