THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:54:07 PM
Sengar, Pankaj Singh
CPSO#:
81733
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
Oshawa Clinic
1300 Keith Ross Drive
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-6153
Fax: (905) 721-6671
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Pankaj S. Sengar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
EL - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 04 Dec 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 04 Dec 2012 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 8, 2020, Dr. Sengar has completed all requirements of his SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)