THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:56:00 AM
Nabavi, Mitra
CPSO#:
81726
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pathology Department
381 church street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905)472-7591 Ext. 6681
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MITRA NABAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2009 |