THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:51:33 AM
Joshua, Anthony Michael
CPSO#:
81724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2520
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua and Dr. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Oct 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2004 to 01 Oct 2004
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |