THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:37:18 AM
Vaughan, Matthew Mountfort
CPSO#:
81714
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Radiology
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 May 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW MOUNTFORT VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2007 |