THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:34:11 AM
Nadjafabadi Farahani, Pendar
CPSO#:
81711
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6990 Derry Road
Suite 105
Milton ON L9T 7H3
Phone: (289) 429-0284
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PENDAR NADJAFABADI FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADJAFABADI FARAHANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2015 |