THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:42:02 AM
Narine, Rishi Avinash
CPSO#:
81698
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RISHI AVINASH NARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2006 |