THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:44:17 AM
Johnson, Suni John
CPSO#:
81670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2747
Fax: (519) 376-2097
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNI JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2005 |