THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:46:13 PM
Sannoufi, Hassan
CPSO#:
81658
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Russian
Education: Kalinin State Medical Institute, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20-275 Slater St
Ottawa ON K1P 5H9
Phone: 613-231-3666
Fax: 613-231-4551
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASSAN SANNOUFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANNOUFI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2005 |