THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:20:46 AM
Joseph, Philip George
CPSO#:
81652
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40743
Fax: (905) 297-3789
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2010 |