THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:13:08 AM
Puttappa Shivananda, Sandesh Kiran
CPSO#:
81651
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
01 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada
Education: Mysore University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shivananda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:BC Womens Hospital and Health Centre
Room 1R-19
4500 Oak Street
Vancouver, BC V6H 3V4
Tel: 604 875 2135 ext. 7353
Fax: 604 875 3106
Date Received: 10 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2016 |