THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:40:37 AM
Visbal Moreno, Antonio Luis
CPSO#:
81624
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad De Cartagena, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3P4
Phone: (705) 568-2131
Fax: (705) 568-2133
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTONIO LUIS VISBAL MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL MORENO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2009 |