THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:29:07 PM
Gunawardena, Sinhapalage Yamuna Krishanthi
CPSO#:
81617
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Spanish
Education: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2937 Major Mackenzie Dr
South Mackenzie Kids Clinic
Maple ON L6A 3N9
Phone: 905 553 0305
Fax: 9055530350
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SINHAPALAGE YAMUNA KRISHANTHI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2004 to 15 Sep 2004
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2010 |