THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:29:16 AM
Robson, Daniel Guy
CPSO#:
81557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
1333 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto ON M2J 1V1
Phone: 416-740-1333
Fax: 416-740-8702
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Robson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL GUY ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2007 |