THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:49:51 PM
Ramachandran Nair, Rajesh
CPSO#:
81553
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3A- Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |
|
Active |