THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:32:33 AM
MacLean, Jonathan Alan
CPSO#:
81550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200-25 Main St W
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 75246
Fax: 9055218552
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jonathan MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013
Corporation Name: Jonathan MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN ALAN MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |