THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:42:26 AM
Sivarajah, Kalawathy
CPSO#:
81538
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: University of Peradeniya, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kalawathy Sivarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
AVP - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |