THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:34:58 AM
Barton-Forbes, Michelle Ann
CPSO#:
81535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58299
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Feb 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 21 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
|
Active |