THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:35:35 AM
Oliveira, Liliana Margarida
CPSO#:
81528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 29
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILIANA MARGARIDA OLIVEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVEIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2005 to 01 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2008 |