THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:40:07 AM
Nistico, Amy Ruth-Ann
CPSO#:
81522
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sydor, Amy Ruth-Ann (used until: 08 Aug 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor North Tower, Room 9618
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 4990
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Aug 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY RUTH-ANN NISTICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NISTICO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2005 to 21 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2006 to 27 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2007 to 27 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |