THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:19:38 PM
Kaprielian, Anoush Ashen
CPSO#:
81521
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANOUSH ASHEN KAPRIELIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRIELIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2008 |