THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:18:20 PM
Wasowicz, Marcin
CPSO#:
81490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dep. of Anesthesia and Pain Manag.
Eaton North 3 Room 424
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
|
Active |