THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:04:16 AM
Crean, Andrew Michael
CPSO#:
81479
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Southampton, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
Rm 4414B
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7267 Ext. 67267
Fax: (613) 696-7248
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Crean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:17 Aug 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:22 Oct 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2016 |
|
Active |