THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:37:11 PM
Shi, Dawn Donghui
CPSO#:
81478
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Shi, Dong Hui (used until: 08 Mar 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Shanghai Second Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20 Norton Avenue
Waterdrop Medical & Cosmetic Centre
North York ON M2N 0C6
Phone: (416) 901-5736
Fax: (416) 901-5768
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Aug 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAWN DONGHUI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2007 |