THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:57:37 PM
Bittira, Bindu
CPSO#:
81466
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Kannada
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Suite M-131
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-5353
Fax: (705) 671-5352
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BINDU BITTIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITTIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |